judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 8th Court Of Appeals

Case: 08-81-00222-CV
08-81-00222-CV
10/30/1981
Miscellaneous civil
Barclay, Maurice L.
EPIC Associates XXIX
No
1st Court of Appeals
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/05/1984Shuck purged
05/04/1982Mandate Issued
02/24/1982Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
02/24/1982Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
02/17/1982Submitted
02/17/1982Submission
02/17/1982Submitted
12/30/1981Submission
10/30/1981Brief Filed
10/30/1981Brief Filed
10/30/1981Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals
10/30/1981Filing Fee Paid
10/30/1981Supplemental Transcript Filed
10/30/1981Transcript Filed
10/30/1981Case ready to be set
10/30/1981Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
05/04/1982Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
UnknownAppellee
UnknownAppellant
Trial Court Information
151st District Court
Harris
79-51922