judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 8th Court Of Appeals

Case: 08-81-00211-CV
08-81-00211-CV
10/30/1981
Miscellaneous civil
Guerra, Felix Noe, Jr.
Sharpstown Dodge Sales, Inc. et al.
No
1st Court of Appeals
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/05/1984Shuck purged
05/03/1982Mandate Issued
03/03/1982Opinion issuedAffirmed
03/03/1982Opinion issuedAffirmed
02/16/1982Submitted
02/16/1982Submission
02/16/1982Submitted
12/30/1981Submission
10/30/1981Brief Filed
10/30/1981Brief Filed
10/30/1981Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals
10/30/1981Statement of Facts Filed
10/30/1981Sup. St. of Facts Filed
10/30/1981Supplemental Brief Filed
10/30/1981Supplemental Transcript Filed
10/30/1981Transcript Filed
10/30/1981Case ready to be set
10/30/1981Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
05/03/1982Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
UnknownAppellant
UnknownAppellee
Trial Court Information
1,135,373