judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 8th Court Of Appeals

Case: 08-81-00213-CV
08-81-00213-CV
10/30/1981
Miscellaneous civil
Cameo Construction Company, et al.
Campbell, Monte M., et ux.
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
02/15/2013Case sent to State Archives
06/05/1984Shuck purged
12/07/1982Mandate Issued
10/06/1982Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
10/06/1982Response to Petition, Motion or Inquiry
09/22/1982Motion for Rehearing Filed
09/08/1982Opinion issuedMotion or Writ Granted
09/08/1982Motion for Rehearing DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
08/06/1982Envelope Filed, showing postmark date
08/06/1982Motion for Rehearing Filed
07/21/1982Opinion issuedAffirmed
07/21/1982Opinion issuedAffirmed
02/16/1982Submitted
02/16/1982Submission
02/16/1982Submitted
12/07/1981Submission
10/30/1981Brief Filed
10/30/1981Brief Filed
10/30/1981Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals
10/30/1981Deposition Filed
10/30/1981Supplemental Transcript Filed
10/30/1981Transcript Filed
10/30/1981Case ready to be set
10/30/1981Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
02/15/2013Case StoredCase archived
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
UnknownAppellant
UnknownAppellee
Trial Court Information
164th District Court
Harris
78-27313