judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 8th Court Of Appeals

Case: 08-81-00212-CV
08-81-00212-CV
10/30/1981
Miscellaneous civil
Surovik, Minnie D. Individually and as Independent Executrix
Hejl, John Edward
No
1st Court of Appeals
03/03/1981
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
12/15/2003Case file destroyed - case has met retention schedule and had no historical value to this court
06/05/1984Shuck purged
02/04/1983Mandate Issued
09/29/1982Motion for Dismissal DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
09/29/1982Opinion issuedDismissed
09/29/1982Judgment IssuedDismissed
09/13/1982Motion for Dismissal Filed
02/16/1982Submitted
02/16/1982Submission
02/16/1982Submitted
12/30/1981Submission
10/30/1981Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals
10/30/1981Case ready to be set
10/30/1981Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
02/04/1983Case StoredCourt has determined no historical value - file to be destroyed once retention schedule has been met
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
UnknownAppellee
UnknownAppellant
Trial Court Information
21st District Court
Burleson
17090