judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 4th Court Of Appeals

Case: 04-81-00391-CR
04-81-00391-CR
10/30/1981
Arson
Troncosa, Jr., Rudy Benny
Texas, The State of
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
07/14/2014Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
04/06/1984Mandate Executed By The Trial Court
04/06/1984Mandate Issued
04/06/1984Mandate Issued
02/15/1984Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
02/15/1984Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
06/15/1983Submission
06/15/1983Submission
06/15/1983Submitted
08/11/1982Case ready to be set
08/11/1982Case ready to be set
08/11/1982Motion f/l/file Supp. Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
08/11/1982Case ready to be set
08/03/1982Motion f/l/file Supp. Brief Filed
07/28/1982Supplemental Brief Filed
07/28/1982Supplemental Brief Received
07/15/1982No Description Available.
07/15/1982Brief Filed
07/15/1982Brief Recd (If in excess of page limit and/or late)
07/15/1982No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
07/07/1982No Description Available.
06/11/1982Appeal Reinstated
06/11/1982Motion for Reconsideration DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
06/11/1982Appeal Reinstated
06/09/1982Motion for Reconsideration Filed
05/18/1982Motion for Reconsideration DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
04/08/1982Motion for Reconsideration Filed
04/05/1982Appeal Dismissed
04/05/1982Appeal DismissedDismissed
03/15/1982Record Filed
03/12/1982Record Approved
03/10/1982No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
02/11/1982No Description Available.
02/01/1982No Description Available.Motion Granted in Part
01/15/1982No Description Available.
01/08/1982No Description Available.
10/30/1981Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
10/29/1981Notice of Appeal Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/14/2014Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
226th Judicial District Court
Bexar
Honorable Ted Butler
81-CR-1535
5 Years