judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

STATE, BUSINESS & INDUSTRY VS. HOTEL RAMADA

Case Information: 34849
Short Caption:STATE, BUSINESS & INDUSTRY VS. HOTEL RAMADACourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A366561Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:09/24/1999 / Kunin, IsraelSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/20/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
09/20/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 99-08863
09/20/1999Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement. Due Date: 10 days
09/24/1999Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Israel Kunin. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts and docketing statement suspended pending further order of this court.)
09/27/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Case Appeal Statement. Filed in district court on: September 23, 1999. 99-09198
12/09/1999Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: January 28, 2000. 99-12350
02/22/2000Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. 00-02793
02/22/2000Settlement Program Motion/StipulationFiled Settlement Program/Stipulated Dismissal. 00-02796
03/06/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference held in this matter and the stipulation of the parties, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs. SNP/CLK 00-03506
03/06/2000Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.