judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

GEORGE CREECY v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-08-0211)
Case Number:S-08-0211Case Docketed On:09/29/2008
Status:Closed
Original Court:Third Judicial District Uinta CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against the Person 6-2-101 - 6-2-509
Short Title:GEORGE CREECY v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:GEORGE CREECY, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantGeorge CreecyDiane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
Kirk Allan Morgan
AppelleeThe State of WyomingBruce A. Salzburg
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Graham Macdonald Smith

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law -Self Defense
Opinion Number:2009 WY 89
Citation:210 P.3d 1089

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
09/29/2008Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
09/29/2008Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
09/29/2008Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
10/06/2008Notice-Incoming - Amended indexNotice-IncomingAmended indexFinal
11/13/2008Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellant.MotionExtension of time - briefFinal
11/13/2008Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for extension of time to file brief; and received proposed order.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
11/14/2008Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
01/02/2009Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
01/02/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of appellant; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
02/09/2009Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
02/10/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee and copy of Designation of Record on appealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
02/13/2009Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
03/02/2009Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
03/02/2009Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
04/07/2009Event - Expedited AssignmentEventBrief Only AssignmentFinal
04/08/2009Event - Phone Call. Called Clerk of District Court regarding record. They never received record request letter. Faxed a copy of the letter and they will forward the record as soon as possible.EventPhone CallFinal
04/13/2009Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
04/13/2009Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court, two volumes. Volume I - (2) Original Papers; Volume II, (3) Transcripts.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
04/13/2009Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
07/10/2009Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming. Justice Kite writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
07/28/2009Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
07/28/2009Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
07/28/2009Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
07/28/2009Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
08/03/2009Service - Certified mail signature return card. Record signed for 7/30/09.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal