judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

CHRISTOPHER L. PALMER V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CM-1384
Short Caption:CHRISTOPHER L. PALMER V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CMD10462-10Filed Date:11/01/2010

Opening Event Date:11/01/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:07/26/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:09/19/2012
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantChristopher L. Palmer Y
Jejomar G. UntalanYY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Elizabeth TrosmanNY
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
Kendra D. BriggsNN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
11/01/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
11/10/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that Jejomar Untalan, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (By: JAC)
11/10/2010APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Jejomar Untalan, Esquire
12/28/2010MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE STATEMENT RE TRANSCRIPT no oppo
12/28/2010RECEIVED - aplt's statement regarding transcripts
12/28/2010CHANGE OF ADDRESS RECEIVED Jejomar G. Untalan
01/04/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (48pgs/Tape) 10/14/10 proc. w/CD
01/04/2011RECORD COPIES
01/04/2011RECORD INDEX
01/13/2011 On consideration of appellant's motion for leave to file the lodged statement regarding transcript, it is ORDERED that appellant's motion is granted and the lodged statement regarding transcript is filed. (By: JAC)
01/13/2011STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (rt ordered/needed)dfe
01/19/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (5pgs/Tape) 6/11/10 proc.
01/19/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #3 (6pgs/Tape) 6/18/10 proc.
01/19/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #4 (6pgs/Tape) 8/2/10 proc. w/CD
07/26/2011FiledSupplemental Record - #5 (99pgs/Tape) 10/13/10 proc. w/CD
07/26/2011FiledRecord Completed
08/03/2011FiledBriefing Order
09/12/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief - until November 14, 2011 (Appellant)Granted
09/27/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting appellant's motion for an extension of time to file the brief and limited appendix until November 14, 2011
11/14/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant)Granted
11/16/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting appellant's motion for an extension of time to file the brief and limited appendix until December 5, 2011
12/08/2011FiledMotion For Leave to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant)Granted
12/19/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee)Granted
12/27/2011FiledOrder Granting appellant's Motion For Leave to file the lodged brief and limited appendix and granting apepllee's motion for an extenison of time to file the brief until February 13, 2012
12/27/2011FiledBrief (Appellant)
12/27/2011FiledAppendix (Appellant)
02/13/2012FiledMotion For Summary Affirmance (Appellee)Granted
02/14/2012FiledTMC//MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE
08/28/2012FiledOrder Granting Motion for Summary Affirmance
08/28/2012FiledAffirmed
09/19/2012FiledMandate