judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: B-1390
B-1390
02/17/1969
Application for Writ of Error
LUISA BRIONES, ET VIR
LEVINES DEPARTMENT STORE, INC.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
09/12/1969Response to Brief filedRespondent
09/08/1969Reply to ResponsePetitioner
08/13/1969Motion for RehearingPetitioner
03/06/1969Response to PetitionRespondent
02/17/1969Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
10/22/1969Dissenting opinion issued.
09/12/1969Response to Brief filed
09/08/1969Reply to Response
08/22/1969Response to Motion filed
08/13/1969Motion for RehearingOverruled
07/30/1969Opinion issued
05/20/1969Miscellaneous letter
04/02/1969Document received (See Remarks)
04/02/1969Document received (See Remarks)
03/06/1969Response to Petition
02/17/1969Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
02/17/1969Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Levines Department Store, Inc.Respondent
Luisa Briones, et virPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information