judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 4th Court Of Appeals

Case: 04-81-00396-CR
04-81-00396-CR
11/03/1981
Murder-Voluntary Manslaughter
Garza, Jr., Joe
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
09/20/1983Mandate Executed By The Trial Court
09/20/1983Mandate Issued
09/20/1983Mandate Issued
07/29/1983Opinion issuedAffirmed
07/29/1983Opinion issuedAffirmed
06/21/1983Submission
06/21/1983Submission
06/21/1983Submitted
06/20/1983Case ready to be set
06/20/1983Case ready to be set
05/19/1983Mot. EOT to file Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
05/16/1983Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed
05/11/1983Motion for Appointment of Counsel DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
05/09/1983Motion for Appointment of Counsel Filed
12/15/1981Brief Filed
11/25/1981Brief Filed
11/03/1981Record Filed
11/03/1981Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
10/30/1981Record Approved
07/17/1981Notice of Appeal Filed
07/17/1981Date of Sentencing in Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
03/20/2013Case StoredPermanent retention required in criminal case
09/20/1983Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
144th Judicial District Court
Bexar
Honorable ROY R. BARRERA, SR.
81-CR-1017A
15-30 Years