judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 1st Court Of Appeals

Case: 01-81-00786-CR
01-81-00786-CR
11/02/1981
Marijuana Possession
Yorganson, Glenda Diane
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
05/31/1985Mandate issued - criminal or civil
03/14/1985Opinion issuedAffirmed
02/26/1985Submitted
01/21/1985Waiver
01/11/1985Submission
12/17/1984Brief filed
11/14/1984Order entered
12/27/1983Order entered
12/27/1983Submission
11/21/1983Brief due for retained counsel
11/02/1981Notice of appeal filed
11/02/1981Record filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
05/31/1985Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
StateCriminal - Appellant
StateCriminal - State of Texas
Trial Court Information
23rd District Court
Brazoria
Honorable PAUL F. FERGUSON
12,859
3 years