judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 1st Court Of Appeals

Case: 01-81-00911-CR
01-81-00911-CR
11/01/1981
Other Felony
Hall, Jerry A.
State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
04/17/1985Mandate issued - criminal or civil
04/17/1985Mandate issued - criminal or civil
04/11/1985Case file returned from higher Court or agency.
03/20/1985No description available.Refused
08/22/1984No description available.
07/19/1984Opinion issuedAffirmed
07/19/1984Opinion issuedAffirmed
07/05/1984Brief filed
07/05/1984Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
06/27/1984Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
06/20/1984Submitted
06/20/1984Submission
06/20/1984Submitted
04/27/1984Submission
04/12/1984Brief filed
04/12/1984Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
04/12/1984Case ready to be set
04/03/1984Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
03/15/1984Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
03/02/1984Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
02/16/1984Motion to extend time to file state of facts dispGrant motion
02/16/1984Statement of facts filed
02/02/1984Motion to extend time to file statement of facts
01/23/1984Record past due
11/01/1981Notice of appeal filed
11/01/1981Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
04/17/1985Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
StateCriminal - Appellant
StateCriminal - Appellant
StateCriminal - State of Texas
Trial Court Information