judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 10th Court Of Appeals

Case: 10-81-00179-CR
10-81-00179-CR
11/02/1981
Murder
Stella Marie Brown
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/18/1982Case stored
06/18/1982Mandate issued by this Court
04/15/1982Opinion issuedAffirmed
04/01/1982Submitted
11/02/1981Notice of Appeal filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
06/18/2082Case StoredPermanent retention required in criminal case
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
13th District Court
Navarro
21,122
30 Years