judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

IN THE MATTER OF THE WORKER'S COMPENSATION CLAIM OF ROGER KACZMAREK: CANNON OIL AND GAS WELL SERVICE, INC. v. ROGER KACZMAREK

Case Heading (S-08-0209)
Case Number:S-08-0209Case Docketed On:09/26/2008
Linked To: S-08-0208
Status:Closed
Original Court:Third Judicial District Sweetwater CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Labor and Employment (Title 27)
Short Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE WORKER'S COMPENSATION CLAIM OF ROGER KACZMAREK: CANNON OIL AND GAS WELL SERVICE, INC. v. ROGER KACZMAREK
Full Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE WORKER'S COMPENSATION CLAIM OF ROGER KACZMAREK: CANNON OIL AND GAS WELL SERVICE, INC., Appellant (Respondent), v. ROGER KACZMAREK, Appellee (Claimant).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantCannon Oil and Gas Well Service, Inc.Clark D. Stith
Melissa Jayde Lyon
AppelleeRoger KaczmarekJames R. Salisbury

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:2009 WY 110
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
09/26/2008Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
09/26/2008Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
09/26/2008Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
09/26/2008Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
11/10/2008Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
11/13/2008Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of AppellantEventHardcopy receivedFinal
11/14/2008Notice-Incoming - Designation of record from counsel for appellant (Improper Certificate of Service).Notice-IncomingDesignation of recordFinal
12/18/2008Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
12/19/2008Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of AppelleeEventHardcopy receivedFinal
01/07/2009Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
01/08/2009Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
01/08/2009Notice-Internal - VetoNotice-InternalVetoFinal
01/09/2009Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
01/14/2009Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
01/14/2009Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court, three volumes. Volumes I-II, Original Papers; Volume III, Agency Record.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
01/14/2009Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
01/16/2009Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Melissa Lyon for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
01/23/2009Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - James Salisbury for Appellee Kaczmarek.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
01/27/2009Notice-Incoming - Entry of appearance by Melissa J. Lyon on behalf of Cannon Oil and Gas Well ServiceNotice-IncomingEntry of appearanceFinal
02/18/2009Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (James Michael Causey, Assistant Attorney General, and Melissa Lyon for appellants; James R. Salisbury for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
02/18/2009Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
09/03/2009Opinion - Opinion and journal order reversing and remanding, Chief Justice Voigt writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
09/14/2009Motion - Fees and costsMotionFees and costsFinal
09/14/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Application for award of attorneys' fees and costs.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
10/06/2009Order - Awarding attorney fees and costsOrderAwarding attorney fees and costsFinal
10/06/2009Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
10/06/2009Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
10/06/2009Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
10/09/2009Service - Certified mail signature return cardServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal