judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

DOLLAR (ALFRED) VS. STATE

Case Information: 34848
Short Caption:DOLLAR (ALFRED) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 38881
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C130151Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:MaupinCase Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:02/25/2000How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/20/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
09/20/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 99-08862
10/26/1999OtherDisqualification of Justice Maupin. Sat in the district court proceedings.
11/12/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Record due: 120 days. fn1--[The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court.] Nos. 34633, 34660, 34722, 34836, 34848, 34871, 34910. 99-11140
02/25/2000Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Volumes 1 and 2. Mailed on 02/23/00. 00-03028
02/25/2000Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
08/08/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. We conclude that appellant is not entitled to relief and that briefing and oral argument are unwarranted. 'ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED.' NNP01A-MS/DA/RR 01-13402
09/05/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 01-13522
09/05/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
09/27/2001RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on September 14, 2001. 01-13522