judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

COLORADO RIVER MUNICIPAL WATER DISTRICT v. HELEN HARRIS WILLCOCKSON, ET VIR

Case: B-1389
B-1389
02/17/1969
Application for Writ of Error
COLORADO RIVER MUNICIPAL WATER DISTRICT
HELEN HARRIS WILLCOCKSON, ET VIR
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
06/30/1969Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
06/19/1969Motion for RehearingPetitioner
04/23/1969Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
04/09/1969Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
03/31/1969Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
03/24/1969Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
03/24/1969Supplement to Petition filedPetitioner
03/13/1969Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
03/04/1969Response to PetitionRespondent
02/17/1969Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
06/30/1969Amicus Curiae Brief received
06/26/1969Response to Motion filed
06/19/1969Motion for RehearingOverruled
04/23/1969Amicus Curiae Brief received
04/09/1969Amicus Curiae Brief received
04/04/1969Motion for leave to file brief
03/31/1969Amicus Curiae Brief received
03/24/1969Amicus Curiae Brief received
03/24/1969Motion for leave to file brief
03/24/1969Supplement to Petition filed
03/14/1969Motion for leave to file brief
03/13/1969Amicus Curiae Brief received
03/04/1969Response to Petition
02/17/1969Application for Writ of Error - Filed
02/17/1969Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Helen Harris Willcockson, et virRespondent
North Central Texas Municipal Water AuthorityAmicus Curiae
Colorado River Municipal Water DistrictPetitioner
Brazos River AuthorityAmicus Curiae
State of TexasAmicus Curiae
City of HoustonAmicus Curiae
Rosser and Carroll and McGinnis, Lochridge, Kilgore, Byfield, Hunter and WilsonAmicus Curiae
Amicus Curiae Committee of the Texas City Attorneys AssociationAmicus Curiae
Trinity River Authority of TexasAmicus Curiae
Tarrant County Water Control and Improvement District No. 1Amicus Curiae
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information