judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 8th Court Of Appeals

Case: 08-81-00253-CR
08-81-00253-CR
11/04/1981
Murder-Voluntary Manslaughter
Jackson, Lee Roy
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
03/30/1988Case Forwarded to Higher Court
03/23/1988Miscellaneous filing
06/05/1984Shuck purged
04/15/1983Mandate Issued
03/23/1983Case Returned from Higher CourtRefused
12/29/1982Case Forwarded to Higher Court
12/22/1982Petition for Discretionary Review
11/24/1982Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
11/12/1982Motion for Rehearing Filed
10/27/1982Opinion issuedAffirmed
08/03/1982Submitted
07/22/1982Reply brief filed.
07/07/1982Submission
05/13/1982Brief Filed
04/12/1982Brief Filed
03/24/1982Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
03/09/1982Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed
01/06/1982Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
12/23/1981Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed
12/18/1981Record filed.
11/04/1981Notice of Appeal Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
01/07/2016RetentionCriminal case to be retained permanently (sentence over 20 years or historical value)
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
UnknownCriminal - State of Texas
UnknownCriminal - Appellant
Trial Court Information
142nd District Court
Midland
Honorable Vann Culp
CRB-8735(3)
Life