judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 8th Court Of Appeals

Case: 08-81-00215-CV
08-81-00215-CV
10/30/1981
Contract
Transamerica Title Insurance Co.
Lowe-Goode, Cynthia Ann
No
1st Court of Appeals
03/31/1981
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/05/1984Shuck purged
09/10/1982Mandate Issued
07/14/1982Opinion issuedAffirmed
07/14/1982Opinion issuedAffirmed
12/30/1981Submission
12/28/1981Filed waiver of oral argument
10/30/1981Brief Filed
10/30/1981Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals
10/30/1981Statement of Facts Filed
10/30/1981Supplemental Transcript Filed
10/30/1981Transcript Filed
10/30/1981Case ready to be set
10/30/1981Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
02/16/1981Submitted
02/16/1981Submission
02/16/1981Submitted
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
09/10/1982Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
UnknownAppellant
UnknownAppellee
Trial Court Information
Co Civil Ct at Law No 1
Harris
314,532