judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 8th Court Of Appeals

Case: 08-81-00250-CR
08-81-00250-CR
11/02/1981
Other Felony
Sims, Wallace Lee
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/05/1984Shuck purged
02/10/1983Mandate Issued
12/22/1982Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
12/09/1982Motion for Rehearing Filed
11/24/1982Opinion issuedAffirmed
08/06/1982Submitted
07/07/1982Submission
02/11/1982Brief Filed
01/13/1982Brief Filed
01/07/1982Record filed.
11/30/1981Notice of Appeal Filed
11/25/1981Miscellaneous Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
11/13/1981No description available.
11/02/1981Notice of Appeal Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
02/10/1983Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
UnknownCriminal - Appellant
UnknownCriminal - State of Texas
Trial Court Information
238th District Court
Midland
Honorable Vann Culp
CRB-8799(2)
Life