judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 10th Court Of Appeals

Case: 10-81-00173-CR
10-81-00173-CR
10/26/1981
Unlawful Carrying a Handgun by License Holder
Lafayette Sanford, Jr.
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/20/1982Case stored
10/20/1982Mandate issued by this Court
08/05/1982Opinion issuedAffirmed
07/15/1982Submitted
10/26/1981Notice of Appeal filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/20/2082Case StoredPermanent retention required in criminal case
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
54th District Court
McLennan
81-234-C
Life