judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 10th Court Of Appeals

Case: 10-81-00172-CR
10-81-00172-CR
10/26/1981
Assault
Patrick Earl Staples
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
07/16/2007Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
05/10/1982Case stored
05/10/1982Mandate issued by this Court
02/25/1982Opinion issuedDismissed
02/19/1982Submitted
10/26/1981Notice of Appeal filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/16/2007Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
County Court at Law No 2
McLennan
800453
60 Days + $1,000 + Court Cost