judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 2nd Court Of Appeals

Case: 02-81-00320-CR
02-81-00320-CR
10/23/1981
Other Drug Possession or Delivery
Hawkins, Charles Douglas
Texas, The State of
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/07/1988Mandate Issued
10/07/1988Mandate Issued
09/21/1988Opinion issuedReversed & Remanded to Trial Court
04/20/1983Order EnteredMotion or Writ Granted
02/28/1983Petition for Discretionary Review Filed in CCA
02/28/1983Order EnteredMotion or Writ Denied
01/12/1983Opinion issuedAffirmed
12/08/1982Submitted
12/08/1982Submission
09/02/1982Brief Filed
08/02/1982Brief Filed
07/21/1982Motion for Extension to File Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
07/16/1982Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed
07/08/1982Submission
06/17/1982Motion for Extension to File Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
05/18/1982Motion for Extension to File Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
04/13/1982Motion for Extension to File Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
03/15/1982Motion for Extension to File Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
02/16/1982Motion for Extension to File Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
01/15/1982Motion for Extension to File Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
12/17/1981Criminal record or relator's record and/or exhibits
10/23/1981Notice of Appeal Filed
10/23/1981Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/18/1988Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
213th District Court
Tarrant
Honorable Clifford Davis
25801
Life, TDC