judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 8th Court Of Appeals

Case: 08-81-00176-CR
08-81-00176-CR
10/23/1981
Robbery
Jones, William Herman
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/05/1984Shuck purged
12/07/1982Mandate Issued
09/08/1982Opinion issuedAffirmed
08/03/1982Submitted
07/07/1982Submission
03/19/1982Filed Ltr re req. for oral argument
03/17/1982Brief Filed
03/17/1982Filed Ltr re req. for oral argument
03/17/1982Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
03/01/1982Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed
02/03/1982Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
01/21/1982Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed
12/30/1981Brief Filed
11/18/1981Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
11/06/1981Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed
10/23/1981Record filed.
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
12/07/1982Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
UnknownCriminal - State of Texas
UnknownCriminal - Appellant
Trial Court Information
34th District Court
El Paso
Honorable Jerry Woodard
3557l-34
15 Yrs.