judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 6th Court Of Appeals

Case: 06-81-00058-CR
06-81-00058-CR
10/23/1981
Other Felony
Vaughan and Sons, Inc.
Texas, The State of
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/06/1988Mandate Issued
04/12/1988Opinion issuedAffirmed
03/15/1988Submitted
03/15/1988Motion for Oral ArgumentOverruled
03/15/1988Submission
02/22/1988Supplemental Brief Filed
02/02/1988Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
01/25/1988Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
01/15/1988Letter re late appellant's brief
11/30/1987Supplemental Brief Filed
11/03/1987Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
11/02/1987MOTION FILED
10/23/1987MOTION FILED
10/14/1987Case Returned from Higher Ct.
09/29/1987Submitted
09/18/1987Case reinstated
09/18/1987Case ready to be set
09/18/1987Case remanded from higher court
09/16/1987Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
06/15/1983Petition for Discretionary Review FiledMotion or Writ Granted
04/19/1983Case Forwarded to Higher Court
04/08/1983Petition for Discretionary Review Filed
02/22/1983Opinion issuedReversed and Dismissed
03/29/1982Submitted
03/29/1982Submission
10/23/1981Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
04/01/1981Brief Filed
04/01/1981Brief Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
06/06/1988Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
County Criminal Court at Law No. 8
Harris
Honorable D. Neel Richardson
553194
$5,000 Fine