judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 4th Court Of Appeals

Case: 04-81-00363-CV
04-81-00363-CV
10/23/1981
Injunction
Medina Lake Protection Association
Bexar-Medina-Atascosa Counties Water Control & Improvement
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
11/29/1983Copies of Exhibits Returned to Attorneys
11/14/1983Mandate Issued
11/14/1983Mandate Issued
11/07/1983Case Returned from Higher Court
10/12/1983Higher Court DecisionRefused
08/11/1983Writ of Error filed
07/12/1983Motion for Rehearing DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
06/23/1983Response to Motion Filed
06/16/1983Motion for Rehearing Filed
06/01/1983Opinion issued
06/01/1983Motion to Conform Judgment DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
05/12/1983Motion to Conform Judgment Filed
04/29/1983Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
04/29/1983Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
07/13/1982Submission
07/13/1982Submission
07/13/1982Submitted
07/06/1982Brief Filed
07/06/1982Brief Filed
05/17/1982Motion to Advance DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
04/26/1982Motion to Advance Filed
03/19/1982Brief Filed
12/29/1981Brief Filed
12/29/1981Case ready to be set
12/04/1981Brief Filed
11/25/1981No Description Available.
11/20/1981Mot. EOT to file Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
11/20/1981Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed
11/16/1981No Description Available.
11/16/1981No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
11/05/1981No Description Available.
10/29/1981No Description Available.
10/29/1981No Description Available.
10/29/1981No Description Available.
10/23/1981Record Filed
10/23/1981Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
10/13/1981Appeal Bond Filed
09/28/1981Judgment Signed in Trial Court
02/25/1981Brief Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
11/29/1983Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
38th Judicial District Court
Medina
Honorable Rose Spector
8389-A