judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 4th Court Of Appeals

Case: 04-81-00362-CV
04-81-00362-CV
10/23/1981
Miscellaneous civil
Killian, John M.
Trans Union Leasing Corporation
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
08/06/1984Original Exhibits Returned
08/06/1984Mandate Issued
08/06/1984Mandate Issued
07/23/1984Case Returned from Higher Court
05/23/1984Higher Court DecisionRefused
11/01/1983Case Forwarded to Higher Court
10/12/1983Writ of Error filed
09/14/1983Motion for Rehearing DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
09/06/1983Motion for Rehearing Filed
08/31/1983Opinion issuedAffirmed and Reformed
08/31/1983Opinion issuedAffirmed and Reformed
08/31/1983Opinion issuedAffirmed and Reformed
06/21/1983Submission
06/21/1983Submission
06/21/1983Submitted
03/30/1982Case ready to be set
03/30/1982Motion for Dismissal DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
03/30/1982Case ready to be set
03/03/1982Motion for Dismissal Filed
01/12/1982Brief Filed
12/14/1981No Description Available.
11/12/1981No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
10/29/1981No Description Available.
10/23/1981No Description Available.
10/23/1981Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
08/06/1984Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
57th Judicial District Court
Bexar
Honorable James E. Barlow
79-CI-18073
n/a