judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 10th Court Of Appeals

Case: 10-81-00167-CR
10-81-00167-CR
10/26/1981
Poss of Marihuana
Jon Q. Gilland
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/09/2007Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
09/20/1982Case stored
09/20/1982Mandate issued by this Court
04/08/1982Opinion issuedAffirmed
02/12/1982Submitted
10/26/1981Notice of Appeal filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/09/2007Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
87th District Court
Freestone
9473-B
8 Years + $5,000 Fine