judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

IN RE: RALPH T. MABRY, JR

Case Information: 10-BG-1374
Short Caption:IN RE: RALPH T. MABRY, JRClassification:Bar Governance - Bar - Disciplinary Original
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:BDN190-07Filed Date:11/04/2010

Opening Event Date:11/04/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerBar CounselN
Wallace E. Shipp NN
Becky NealNY
PetitionerBoard on Professional ResponsibilityN
Charles J. WilloughbyNN
RespondentRalph T. Mabry NPro SeN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
11/04/2010REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF BOARD ON PROF. RESP. that respondent be disbarred from the practice of law and that his reinstatement be conditioned on his reimbursing the Estate, its beneficiaries, and/or the Clients' Security Fund the amounts he improperly withdrew from the Estate, with interest at the legal rate. The disbarment should be deemed to commence, for purposes of reinstatement, from the date respondent files the affidavit required by D.C. Bar R. XI, Sec 14 (g).
11/08/2010LETTER from the Office of Bar Counsel taking no exception to the report and recommendation of the Board on Professional Responsibility.
11/16/2010ORDER On consideration of the report and recommendation of the Board on Professional Responsibility that the court disbar respondent from the practice of law in the District of Columbia and that his reinstatement be conditioned on his reimbursing the Estate, its beneficiaries, and /or the Clients' Security Fund the amounts he improperly withdrew from the Estate, with interest at the legal rate, the disbarment should be deemed to commence, for purposes of reinstatement, from the date respondent files the affidavit required by D.C. Bar Rule XI, Sec 14 (g), it is ORDERED that respondent show cause within thirty days why the court should not enter an order of suspension pending final action on the Board on Professional Responsibility's recommendation. It is FURTHER ORDERED that respondent's attention is drawn to the requirement of Rule XI, Sec 14 relating to suspended attorneys and to the provisions of Rule XI, Sec 16 (c) dealing with the timing of eligibility for reinstatement as related to complaince with Rule XI, Sec 14, including the filing of the required affidavit. (ETW)
01/05/2011TMC - OTSC - report and recommendation of the BOPR - draft order - draft opinion
01/11/2011ORDER On consideration of this court's November 16, 2010, order directing respondent to show cause why he should not be suspended pending final action on the Board on Professional Responsibility's report and recommendation, to which no response has been filed, it is ORDERED that Ralph T. Mabry, Jr., is hereby suspended from the practice of law in the District of Columbia, effective immediately and pending further order of this court. See D.C. Bar R. XI, Sec 9 (g)(2)(a). (BR,TE,FA)
01/27/2011DISBARMENT ORDERED that Ralph T. Mabry, Jr., Esquire, is hereby disbarred from the practice of law in the District of Columbia. For purposes of reinstatement, respondent's disbarment will be deemed to have commenced on the date he files an affidavit in compliance with D.C. Bar R. XI, Sec 14 (g). Additionally, for purposes of reinstatement, respondent must demonstrate that he has reimbursed the Estate, its beneficiaries, and/or the Clients' Security Fund in the amount of $12,033.66 plus accrued interest. (BR,TE,FA)
02/16/2011RECEIVED from the Office of Bar Counsel a notice of nonfiling by respondent the required affidavit pursuant to D.C. Bar R. XI, Sec 14.