judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

MONIQUE JOY CRAIN v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-08-0215)
Case Number:S-08-0215Case Docketed On:10/01/2008
Linked To: S-09-0002 , S-08-0252
Status:Closed
Original Court:Sixth Judicial District Campbell CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against the Person 6-2-101 - 6-2-509
Short Title:MONIQUE JOY CRAIN v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:MONIQUE JOY CRAIN, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantMonique Joy CrainDiane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
Eric M. Alden
AppelleeThe State of WyomingBruce A. Salzburg
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Graham Macdonald Smith

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Constitutional Law, Criminal Law
Opinion Number:2009 WY 128
Citation:218 P.3d 934

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
10/01/2008Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
10/01/2008Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
10/01/2008Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
11/18/2008Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
11/18/2008Event - Hardcopy received Brief of Appellant and copy of designation of record on appealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
12/30/2008Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
01/02/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee and received copy of Designation of RecordEventHardcopy receivedFinal
01/12/2009Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
01/21/2009Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
01/22/2009Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
01/27/2009Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
01/27/2009Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court, two volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Confidential Folder.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
01/27/2009Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
03/03/2009Event - Expedited AssignmentEventBrief Only AssignmentFinal
04/09/2009Order - Consolidating cases for purpose of decisionOrderConsolidating casesFinal
05/19/2009Order - Consolidating casesOrderConsolidating casesFinal
10/22/2009Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Hill writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
11/09/2009Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
11/09/2009Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
11/09/2009Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
11/09/2009Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
11/12/2009Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 11/10/09 in Case S-08-0215.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal