judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 10th Court Of Appeals

Case: 10-81-00168-CR
10-81-00168-CR
10/26/1981
Aggravated Robbery
David Vance Ludwig
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
04/07/2008Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
01/10/1983Case stored
01/10/1983Mandate issued by this Court
07/29/1982Opinion issuedAffirmed
05/06/1982Submitted
10/26/1981Notice of Appeal filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
04/07/2008Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
85th District Court
Brazos
12,883
5 Years, $5,000 Fine