judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 10th Court Of Appeals

Case: 10-81-00175-CR
10-81-00175-CR
10/26/1981
Burglary of a Building
Fidel Ortega
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
07/16/2007Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
06/18/1982Case stored
06/18/1982Mandate issued by this Court
04/08/1982Opinion issuedAffirmed
02/25/1982Submitted
10/26/1981Notice of Appeal filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/16/2007Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
272nd District Court
Brazos
13,044
10 Years