judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 14th Court Of Appeals

Case: 14-81-00757-CR
14-81-00757-CR
10/26/1981
Murder-Voluntary Manslaughter
Long, Linda Dorma
The State of Texas
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
03/29/1984Mandate Issued
03/29/1984Record RETURNED from Higher Court
02/29/1984Petition for Discretionary ReviewDENIED
11/22/1983Petition for Discretionary Review
11/17/1983Petition for Discretionary Review
10/20/1983No description available.GRANTED
10/19/1983No description available.GRANTED
10/17/1983No description available.
10/03/1983Mandate Issued
08/04/1983Opinion issuedAFFIRMED
05/18/1983Submission
03/28/1983Case ready to be set
10/12/1982AM CUR, OTHER,
09/09/1982AM CUR, OTHER,
07/29/1982Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
02/03/1982Record Filed (Both records FILED)
10/26/1981Notice of Appeal FILED - APP
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
03/29/1984Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - State of Texas
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationAppellant
Trial Court Information
230th District Court
Harris
Honorable VAN C. STOVALL
332,036
16 years