judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 10th Court Of Appeals

Case: 10-81-00170-CR
10-81-00170-CR
10/26/1981
Sexual Assault
Benny Wade Clewis
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
03/16/2011Letter issued by the court
02/18/2011Letter received
01/06/1983Case stored
01/06/1983Mandate issued by this Court
08/12/1982Opinion issuedAffirmed
07/22/1982Submitted
10/26/1981Notice of Appeal filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
01/06/2083Case StoredPermanent retention required in criminal case
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Clewis, Benny WadeAppellantBenny Wade Clewis
Trial Court Information
54th District Court
McLennan
81-105-C
Life