judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 1st Court Of Appeals

Case: 01-81-00790-CR
01-81-00790-CR
10/22/1981
Rape
Nutt, James Wiley
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
02/27/1984Mandate issued - criminal or civil
12/29/1983Opinion issuedAffirmed
11/23/1983Submitted
10/28/1983Submission
09/29/1982Brief filed
08/30/1982Brief filed
06/03/1982Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.
05/21/1982Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
05/04/1982Record filed
10/22/1981Notice of appeal filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
02/27/1984Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
StateCriminal - State of Texas
StateCriminal - Appellant
Trial Court Information
183rd District Court
Harris
329,233
5 yrs.