judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

NICHOLAS KRAUT V. JAMES H. VANCE

Case Information: 10-DA-0022
Short Caption:NICHOLAS KRAUT V. JAMES H. VANCEClassification:Discretionary - Discretionary - Small Claims
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:SC3-009012-09Filed Date:11/08/2010

Opening Event Date:11/08/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerNicholas Kraut NPro SeN
RespondentJames H. Vance NPro SeN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
11/08/2010APPLICATION FOR ALLOWANCE OF APPEAL Denied
11/08/2010FILING FEE of $10.00.
11/09/2010TMC - application for allowance of appeal
12/16/2010 ORDERED taht the AAA IS HEREBY DENIED... (this court will grant an AAA only where the applicant demonstrates apparent error or a question of law, which has not been but should be decided by this Court)... (THOBFA) (cb)
12/28/2010PETITIONER'S MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION FILED AS PETTION FOR REHEARING EN BANC LW
01/04/2011TMC - motion for reconsideration
01/21/2011 ORDERED that the MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION IS DENIED as applicant provide no new basis to reconsider the denial of his AAA. See Karath v. Generalis, 277 A.2d 650, 651 (DC 1971). (THOBFA) (cb)