judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

NEWRBERG VS. STATE

Case Information: 34854
Short Caption:NEWRBERG VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 36792
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C160306Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/20/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
09/20/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 99-08872
09/30/1999Order/CounselFiled Order/Fast Track/Counsel. Appellant filed his notice of appeal in proper person.This appeal is governed by NRAP 3C. Attorney Craig Jorgenson shall file the transcript request form within10 days and a fast track statement within 40 days. 99-09372
10/19/1999TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 7/22/99, 8/30/99. Court Reporter: Maureen Schorn. 99-10130
11/15/1999MotionFiled Motion to Dismiss Appeal. 99-11205
12/15/1999Order/DispositionalFiled Voluntary Dismissal. Cause appearing, appellant's motion for a voluntary dismissal of this appeal is granted. "ORDER this appeal dismissed." NNP99B-CY/DA/ML 99-12674
12/15/1999Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.