judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

ROBERT L. CUMMINGS v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-08-0218)
Case Number:S-08-0218Case Docketed On:10/03/2008
Status:Closed
Original Court:Sixth Judicial District Crook CountyCase Type:Original Proceeding - Petition for writ of review - Extraordinary Relief
Short Title:ROBERT L. CUMMINGS v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:ROBERT L. CUMMINGS, Petitioner, v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Respondent.

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
PetitionerRobert L. CummingsJulie Nye Tiedeken
RespondentThe State of WyomingBruce A. Salzburg
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Leda M. Pojman

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law -Sentencing -Restitution and Other Assessments
Opinion Number:2009 WY 130
Citation:218 P.3d 257

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
10/03/2008Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
10/03/2008Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
10/03/2008Petition - Writ - reviewPetitionWrit - reviewFinal
11/04/2008Order - Petition for review - grantOrderPetition for review - grantFinal
12/19/2008Brief - PetitionerBriefPetitionerFinal
12/19/2008Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of PetitionerEventHardcopy receivedFinal
01/29/2009Brief - RespondentBriefRespondentFinal
01/30/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of RespondentEventHardcopy receivedFinal
02/02/2009Notice-Incoming - ErrataNotice-IncomingErrataFinal
02/03/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Notice of Citation ErrorEventHardcopy receivedFinal
02/11/2009Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
02/13/2009Brief - Petitioner replyBriefPetitioner replyFinal
02/13/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Petitioner Robert L. Cummings' reply brief.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
02/13/2009Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Julie Nye Tiedeken for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
02/17/2009Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Leda M. Pojman for appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
02/17/2009Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from district court.Notice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
02/26/2009Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
02/26/2009Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court, five volumes. Volume I, Original District Court Papers; Volume II, Original Circuit Court Papers; Volume III, Circuit Court Audio Tapes; Volume IV, Circuit Court Exhibits; Volume V, Certified Copy of Brief in Criminal Case number 1288.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
02/26/2009Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
03/17/2009Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Julie Nye Tiedeken for appellant; Leda M. Pojman, Assistant Attorney General for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
03/17/2009Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
10/23/2009Opinion - Opinion and journal order vacating and remanding, Justice Golden writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
11/10/2009Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
11/10/2009Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
11/10/2009Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
11/10/2009Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
11/13/2009Service - Certified mail signature return cardServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal