judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 1st Court Of Appeals

Case: 01-81-00755-CR
01-81-00755-CR
10/23/1981
Theft
Kennedy, Edwin Graham
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/28/1984Mandate issued - criminal or civil
06/28/1984Opinion issuedDismissed
05/01/1984Case reinstated
04/13/1984Supplemental transcript filed
11/23/1983Mandate issued - criminal or civil
11/10/1983Opinion issuedAbate case
10/20/1983Notice to abate appeal unless app brief filed
12/10/1981Record filed
10/15/1981Notice of appeal filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
06/28/1984Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
StateCriminal - Appellant
StateCriminal - State of Texas
Trial Court Information
184th District Court
Harris
334,234
5 years