judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 4th Court Of Appeals

Case: 04-81-00384-CR
04-81-00384-CR
10/29/1981
Rape
Castro, David
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
07/14/2014Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
02/06/1984Mandate Issued
02/06/1984Mandate Executed By The Trial Court
02/06/1984Mandate Issued
12/14/1983Opinion issuedAffirmed
12/14/1983Opinion issuedAffirmed
06/15/1983Submission
06/15/1983Submission
06/15/1983Submitted
10/29/1981Case ready to be set
10/29/1981Record Filed
10/29/1981Case ready to be set
10/29/1981Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
06/25/1981Brief Filed
06/10/1981Brief Filed
11/24/1980Record Approved
04/16/1980Notice of Appeal Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/14/2014Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
227th Judicial District Court
Bexar
Honorable John G. Yates
79-CR-2268-A
12 Years