judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 4th Court Of Appeals

Case: 04-81-00385-CR
04-81-00385-CR
10/29/1981
Theft
Bullock, Bradford Allen
Texas, The State of
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
07/14/2014Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
06/06/1986Mandate Issued
05/21/1986Higher Court DecisionAffirmed
05/14/1986Submission
02/05/1986Higher Court DecisionMotion or Writ Granted
05/13/1985Case Forwarded to Higher Court
05/03/1985Petition for Review Filed
04/18/1985Mot. f/l/file Response DisposedFiling is Moot
04/17/1985Opinion issuedDismissed-Want of Jurisdiction
04/17/1985No Description Available.
04/17/1985No Description Available.
04/17/1985Appeal Reinstated
04/17/1985Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
03/28/1985No Description Available.
03/28/1985No Description Available.
09/26/1984Opinion issuedAbated
09/26/1984Opinion issuedAbated
09/18/1984Submission
09/18/1984Submitted
09/17/1984No New Event but Update in Calendar
09/14/1984Waives Oral Argument
09/13/1984Response to Motion Filed
09/13/1984Mot. f/l/file Response Filed
09/13/1984Mot. f/l/file Response DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
08/29/1984Response to Motion Filed
08/29/1984Mot. f/l/file Response Filed
07/24/1984Case ready to be set
07/24/1984Case ready to be set
04/24/1984Motion for Rehearing DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
04/24/1984Appeal Reinstated
04/24/1984Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
04/16/1984Record Approved
04/04/1984Motion for Rehearing Filed
03/21/1984Motion for Rehearing En Banc DisposedFiling is Moot
03/21/1984Opinion issuedDismissed
03/21/1984Motion for Dismissal DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
03/21/1984Appeal Reinstated
03/21/1984Opinion issuedDismissed
03/06/1984Motion for Dismissal Filed
03/01/1984Motion for Rehearing En Banc Filed
02/15/1984Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
02/15/1984Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
02/15/1984Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
07/20/1983Motion for Leave DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
07/19/1983Motion for Leave Filed
07/12/1983Submission
07/12/1983Supplemental Authorities Received
07/12/1983Submission
07/12/1983Submitted
07/07/1983Waives Oral Argument
04/17/1983Opinion issuedDismissed-Want of Jurisdiction
10/29/1981Case ready to be set
10/29/1981Record Filed
10/29/1981Case ready to be set
10/29/1981Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
08/20/1981Brief Filed
06/01/1981Brief Filed
08/20/1980Notice of Appeal Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/14/2014Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
175th Judicial District Court
Bexar
Honorable Peter Michael Curry
80-CR-1073
20 Years