judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 1st Court Of Appeals

Case: 01-81-00812-CR
01-81-00812-CR
10/28/1981
Robbery
Sanner, Roy Lester
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
05/01/1985Case file forwarded to higher Court or agency
04/26/1985File requested by Atty. General in Austin
08/23/1984Mandate issued - criminal or civil
07/06/1984Case file returned from higher Court or agency.
06/13/1984No description available.Refused
02/06/1984No description available.
12/29/1983Court's Previous Opinion Withdrawn
12/29/1983Opinion issuedAffirmed
11/23/1983Opinion issuedAffirmed
11/16/1983Record filed
10/18/1983Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
12/23/1982Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.
12/13/1982Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
10/27/1982Motion to extend time to file sup brief
09/30/1982Motion to extend time to file sup brief disp
07/12/1982Brief filed
07/05/1982Brief filed
10/28/1981Notice of appeal filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
08/23/1984Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
StatePRO SE
StateCriminal - Appellant
StateCriminal - State of Texas
StateCriminal - Appellant
Trial Court Information
209th District Court
Harris
Honorable Frank C. Price
326,566
40 years