judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

PEARNS VS. HORSESHOE OPERATING CLUB

Case Information: 34851
Short Caption:PEARNS VS. HORSESHOE OPERATING CLUBCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A388144Classification:Civil Appeal - Administrative Agency - General
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:09/24/1999 / Scotti, RichardSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/20/1999Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from King, Gross & Sutcliffe, Ltd.--check no. 4593.
09/20/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 99-08865
09/24/1999Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Richard F. Scotti. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts and docketing statement suspended pending further order of this court.)
09/29/1999Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 99-09301
12/14/1999Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: December 17, 1999. 99-12595
12/30/1999Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: December 29, 1999. 99-13449
01/24/2000Settlement Program Motion/StipulationFiled Settlement Program/Stipulated Dismissal. 00-01158
02/09/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference held in this matter and the stipulation of the parties, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs and attorneys' fees. SNP/CLK 00-02086
02/09/2000Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.