judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 9th Court Of Appeals

Case: 09-81-00084-CR
09-81-00084-CR
10/30/1981
Burglary
Gates, Henry Charles
Texas, The State of
No
14th Court of Appeals
10/30/1981
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
04/02/1982Mandate Issued
03/31/1982Petition for ReviewRefused
03/19/1982Petition for Review
03/17/1982Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
02/10/1982Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
02/02/1982Motion for Rehearing Filed
12/30/1981Opinion issuedAffirmed
10/30/1981Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
04/02/1982Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
209th District Court
Harris
Honorable Patrick Clark
305,421
99 Years