judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 4th Court Of Appeals

Case: 04-81-00389-CR
04-81-00389-CR
10/29/1981
Murder-Voluntary Manslaughter
Saenz, Benjamin E.
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
07/14/2014Case stored
10/26/1982Mandate Issued
10/26/1982Mandate Issued
07/14/1982Opinion issuedAffirmed
07/14/1982Opinion issuedAffirmed
07/07/1982Submission
07/07/1982Submission
07/07/1982Submitted
06/07/1982Case ready to be set
06/07/1982Case ready to be set
12/18/1981Brief Filed
11/20/1981Brief Filed
11/12/1981Mot. EOT to file Brief DisposedMotion Granted in Part
11/06/1981Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed
10/29/1981Record Filed
10/29/1981Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
10/08/1981Record Approved
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/14/2014Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
227th Judicial District Court
Bexar
Honorable Peter Michael Curry
80-CR-0775
20 years