judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 8th Court Of Appeals

Case: 08-81-00229-CR
08-81-00229-CR
10/30/1981
Robbery
Taylor, Robert
Texas, The State of
No
1st Court of Appeals
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/05/1984Shuck purged
12/07/1982Mandate Issued
11/30/1982Case Returned from Higher Court
11/05/1982Decision from Supreme Court or CCARefused
09/14/1982Case Forwarded to Higher Court
09/07/1982Petition for Discretionary Review
07/21/1982Opinion issued
07/21/1982Opinion issuedAffirmed
02/18/1982Submitted
02/18/1982Submission
02/18/1982Submitted
12/30/1981Submission
10/30/1981Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals
10/30/1981Case ready to be set
10/30/1981Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
12/07/1982Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
UnknownCriminal - Appellant
UnknownCriminal - State of Texas
Trial Court Information
209th District Court
Harris
263374
life