judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 4th Court Of Appeals

Case: 04-81-00381-CV
04-81-00381-CV
10/28/1981
Contract
Astra Bar, Inc.
Southwestern Mud Company, Inc.
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
02/18/1982Mandate Issued
02/18/1982Mandate Issued
12/21/1981Motion for Dismissal DisposedFiling is Moot
12/21/1981Motion for Dismissal DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
12/21/1981Motion for Dismissal DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
12/17/1981Motion for Dismissal Filed
11/20/1981Response to Motion Filed
11/12/1981Motion for Dismissal Filed
10/28/1981No Description Available.
10/28/1981Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
10/21/1981Appeal Bond Filed
07/09/1981Judgment Signed in Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
02/18/1982Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
49th Judicial District Court
Webb
Honorable Ruben Garcia
31,521-A