judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 8th Court Of Appeals

Case: 08-81-00249-CR
08-81-00249-CR
10/30/1981
All Misdemeanors
Willis, Curtis Wayne
Texas, The State of
No
1st Court of Appeals
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/05/1984Shuck purged
10/22/1982Decision from Supreme Court or CCAMotion or Writ Granted
08/20/1982Case Forwarded to Higher Court
08/20/1982Petition for Discretionary Review
07/21/1982Opinion issuedAffirmed
07/21/1982Opinion issuedAffirmed
02/18/1982Submitted
02/18/1982Submission
02/18/1982Submitted
12/30/1981Submission
10/30/1981Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals
10/30/1981Case ready to be set
10/30/1981Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/22/1982Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
UnknownCriminal - Appellant
UnknownCriminal - State of Texas
Trial Court Information
586545
1 yr.+ $2000. fine