judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 1st Court Of Appeals

Case: 01-81-00775-CR
01-81-00775-CR
10/29/1981
Rape
Ramirez, Robert
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/25/1985Mandate issued - criminal or civil
10/09/1985Higher court decisionAffirmed
07/10/1985Submission
03/20/1985No description available.Grant motion
03/20/1985No description available.Refused
07/30/1984No description available.
06/14/1984Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
05/24/1984Brief filed
05/24/1984Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
05/22/1984Submitted
05/18/1984Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
04/26/1984Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
04/18/1984Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
04/05/1984Submission
05/13/1983Brief filed
03/17/1983Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
03/10/1983Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
01/20/1983Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
01/07/1983Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
01/05/1983Record filed
10/29/1981Notice of appeal filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/25/1985Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
StateCriminal - Appellant
StateCriminal - State of Texas
Trial Court Information
240th District Court
Fort Bend
11,333
9 years