judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 1st Court Of Appeals

Case: 01-81-00774-CR
01-81-00774-CR
10/29/1981
Rape
Aguilat, Audencio
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
11/20/1987Mandate issued - criminal or civil
11/04/1987Higher court decisionReversed & Remanded to Tr. Ct.
02/04/1987Submission
07/29/1986Motion to extend time to file brief filed.Grant motion
04/30/1986Petition for discretionary review disposedGrant motion
03/12/1986Petition for writ of error from trial court
02/28/1986Motion for rehearing was not filed
02/13/1986Opinion issuedAffirmed
11/01/1985Case file returned from higher Court or agency.
10/25/1985Mandate issued - criminal or civil
10/09/1985Higher court decisionReversed & Remanded to Ct. App
07/10/1985Submission
03/20/1985No description available.Grant motion
03/20/1985No description available.Refused
07/30/1984No description available.
06/14/1984Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
05/24/1984Brief filed
05/24/1984Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
05/22/1984Submitted
05/18/1984Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
04/26/1984Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
04/19/1984Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
04/05/1984Submission
05/09/1983Brief filed
04/21/1983Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
04/12/1983Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
03/24/1983Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
03/14/1983Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
01/20/1983Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
01/07/1983Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
01/05/1983Record filed
10/29/1981Notice of appeal filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
11/20/1987Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
StateCriminal - State of TexasWilliam Meitzen
StateCriminal - AppellantHon. Ken Hartfield
Trial Court Information
240th District Court
Fort Bend
11,333
9 years