judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 8th Court Of Appeals

Case: 08-81-00226-CR
08-81-00226-CR
10/30/1981
Other Felony
Gainous, Kenneth Ray
Texas, The State of
No
1st Court of Appeals
09/01/1981
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/05/1984Shuck purged
03/22/1983Mandate Issued
02/17/1983Case Returned from Higher CourtRefused
11/03/1982Petition for Discretionary Review
09/22/1982Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
09/10/1982Motion for Rehearing Filed
08/18/1982Miscellaneous Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
08/16/1982No description available.
08/04/1982Miscellaneous Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
07/28/1982Opinion issuedAffirmed
07/28/1982Opinion issuedAffirmed
07/19/1982No description available.
02/18/1982Submission
02/18/1982Submitted
12/30/1981Submission
12/28/1981Brief Filed
10/30/1981Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals
10/30/1981Case ready to be set
10/30/1981Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
03/22/1983Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
UnknownCriminal - State of Texas
UnknownCriminal - Appellant
Trial Court Information
248th District Court
Harris
302843
10 years